ME LD362 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Clarify Coverage for Retired County and Municipal Law Enforcement Officers and Municipal Firefighters Under the State Employer Group Health Plan
Title
An Act to Clarify Coverage for Retired County and Municipal Law Enforcement Officers and Municipal Firefighters Under the State Employer Group Health Plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-03-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-03-21 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2023-03-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-03-21 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2023-03-07 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2023-03-02 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2023-03-02 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-01-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |