ME LD361 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Fair Compensation for Licensed Insurance Agents
Title
An Act To Ensure Fair Compensation for Licensed Insurance Agents
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Foley [R] | Sen. Justin Chenette [D] | Sen. Rodney Whittemore [R] | Rep. Garrel Craig [R] |
Rep. John Picchiotti [R] | Rep. Dwayne Prescott [R] | Rep. Karen Vachon [R] | Rep. Raymond Wallace [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-04 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-69), in concurrence. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-69) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-69). |
2017-04-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-04-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-02-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee on Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed. |