ME LD359 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - LD 359 In Senate, June 22, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - LD 359 In Senate, June 22, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Assist Persons with Breast Cancer
Title
An Act To Assist Persons with Breast Cancer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-22 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #314 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #305 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - Recede And Concur RC #133 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #40 (Y: 111 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #305 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - Recede And Concur RC #133 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #40 (Y: 111 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | Senate | LD 359 In Senate, June 22, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2015-06-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-22 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 305V 145 having voted in the affirmative and 0 in the negative, with 6 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2015-06-22 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2015-06-08 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-02 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 133 (Yeas 142 - Nays 0 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-02 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-144). |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Senate Amendment "B" (S-144) READ and ADOPTED PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "B" (S-144) , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME |
2015-06-01 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-06-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-04-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-04-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-29 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-04-29 | House | READ the Second Time. |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2015-04-28 | House | TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. |
2015-04-28 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2015-04-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 40 (Yeas 111 - Nays 35 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2015-04-28 | House | On motion of Representative BECK of Waterville, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator Whittemore of Somerset, REFERRED to the Committee on Insurance and Financial Services, in concurrence. |
2015-02-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee on Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed. |