ME LD358 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Workers from Unsafe Working Conditions with Regard to Indoor Temperatures
Title
An Act To Protect Workers from Unsafe Working Conditions with Regard to Indoor Temperatures
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce White [D] | Sen. Joseph Baldacci [D] | Rep. Scott Cuddy [D] | Rep. Justin Fecteau [R] |
Sen. David Miramant [D] | Rep. Sarah Pebworth [D] | Rep. Michael Sylvester [D] | Rep. Sophia Warren [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-08 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-26 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-03-26 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-02-04 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-04 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 4, 2021. |