ME LD358 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Funding for Career and Technical Education for Fiscal Year 2019-20
Title
An Act To Increase Funding for Career and Technical Education for Fiscal Year 2019-20
Sponsors
Rep. David Woodsome [R] | Sen. Susan Deschambault [D] | Rep. Chad Grignon [R] | Rep. Beth O'Connor [R] |
Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D] | Rep. Lester Ordway [R] | Rep. Heidi Sampson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - House - Enactment - Emer RC #194 (Y: 86 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN, L. of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-06 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 194 (Yeas 86 - Nays 53 - Absent 9 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-06-06 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken. |
2019-06-06 | House | FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-190). |
2019-06-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-05 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-190) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-05 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-05 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-190) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-190) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-04 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-01-24 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |