ME LD351 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Ensure Accuracy in the Labeling of Maine Meat and Poultry

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Ensure Accuracy in the Labeling of Maine Meat and Poultry

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #163 (Y: 101 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-12HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-12SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-423) in concurrence
2019-06-12SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-423) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-12SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-12SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended By Committee Amendment "A" (H-423) Report ACCEPTED
2019-06-12SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-06-11SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-10SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-07SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-06SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-05SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-04SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-04SenateOn motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
2019-06-03HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-03HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-423).
2019-06-03HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-03HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-423) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-03HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-06-03HouseROLL CALL NO. 163 (Yeas 101 - Nays 37 - Absent 10 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-06-03HouseOn motion of Representative HICKMAN of Winthrop, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-03HouseReports READ.
2019-01-24SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence
2019-01-24HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-24HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
2019-01-24HouseCommittee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback