ME LD350 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Prevent Dog Breed Discrimination by Insurance Companies
Title
An Act to Prevent Dog Breed Discrimination by Insurance Companies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-03-27 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-03-23 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-03-23 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-09 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-01-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |