ME LD349 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - On motion by Senator Herbig of Waldo, REFERRED to the Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business, in concurrence.
Pending: Joint Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Extend the Refundability of the Educational Opportunity Tax Credit to Students in the Behavioral Health Field

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Extend the Refundability of the Educational Opportunity Tax Credit to Students in the Behavioral Health Field

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateOn motion by Senator Herbig of Waldo, REFERRED to the Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business, in concurrence.
2019-02-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-12HouseSubsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS.
2019-02-12HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-02-11HouseUnfinished Business
2019-02-07HouseUnfinished Business
2019-02-05HouseUnfinished Business
2019-01-31HouseUnfinished Business
2019-01-29HouseUnfinished Business
2019-01-24HouseUnfinished Business
2019-01-24HouseLater today assigned.
2019-01-24HouseOn motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, TABLED pending REFERENCE.
2019-01-24HouseCommittee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback