ME LD346 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Make Abuse of Corpse a Class C Crime

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Make Abuse of Corpse a Class C Crime

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-02SenateIn possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
2017-05-31SenateOn motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT
2017-05-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-30HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-05-24HouseIn concurrence.
2017-05-24HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-111).
2017-05-24HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2017-05-24HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-05-23SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2017-05-23SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-111).
2017-05-23SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-111) READ and ADOPTED.
2017-05-23SenateREAD ONCE.
2017-05-23SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2017-02-02HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-02-02HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
2017-02-02SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-02-02SenateREFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY
2017-02-02SenateCommittee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback