ME LD345 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Help New Teachers Succeed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Help New Teachers Succeed

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-07HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-07HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-02SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-05-02SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-153), in concurrence.
2019-05-02SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-153) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-02SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-05-02SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-04-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-30HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-153).
2019-04-30HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-04-30HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-01-24SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
2019-01-24HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-24HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2019-01-24HouseCommittee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback