ME LD345 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 56-6)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 56-6)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure the Confidentiality of Concealed Handgun Permit Holder Personal Information
Title
An Act To Ensure the Confidentiality of Concealed Handgun Permit Holder Personal Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - Senate - Enact-mandate 2/3 Elect RC #54 (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Enactment - Mandate RC #52 (Y: 114 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #47 (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #42 (Y: 106 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #41 (Y: 35 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-04-25 - House - Enactment - Mandate RC #52 (Y: 114 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #47 (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #42 (Y: 106 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #41 (Y: 35 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (25 -Yeas, 8 -Nays, 1 -Excused, 1 -Absent) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Roll Call Number 54 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-25 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 52 (Yeas 114 - Nays 33 - Absent 4 - Excused 0) |
2013-04-25 | House | In accordance with the provisions of Section 21 of Article IX of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken. |
2013-04-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-89), in concurrence.. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-89) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-04-24 | Senate | (27 -Yeas, 8 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Roll Call Number 47 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator VALENTINO of York the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-89) Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-04-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-89). |
2013-04-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-89) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-04-23 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-04-23 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 42 (Yeas 106 - Nays 40 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2013-04-23 | House | On motion of Representative MORIARTY of Cumberland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-04-23 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 41 (Yeas 35 - Nays 111 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2013-04-23 | House | On motion of Representative PRIEST of Brunswick, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED. |
2013-04-23 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator VALENTINO of York REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY, in concurrence. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator VALENTINO of York TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE, in concurrence. |
2013-02-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-12 | House | On motion of Representative DION of Portland, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2013-02-12 | House | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed. |