ME LD342 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - (S) Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - (S) Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing County Jail Budgeting for York County
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing County Jail Budgeting for York County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | (S) Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2011-02-15 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) Taken from the table by the President On motion by Senator THOMAS of Somerset REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-02-08 | (S) On motion by Senator THOMAS of Somerset Tabled Later Today Assigned Pending Reference Unfinished Business | |
2011-02-08 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=342&snum=125 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0104&item=1&snum=125 |