ME LD34 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Address Suspension of an Operator's License for Negligent Operation Causing the Death of Another Person
Title
An Act To Address Suspension of an Operator's License for Negligent Operation Causing the Death of Another Person
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2015-03-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2015-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-19 | House | On motion of Representative McLEAN of Gorham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-03-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-01-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator Collins of York REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-01-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-01-13 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2015-01-13 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2015-01-13 | House | Representative McLEAN for the Criminal Law Advisory Commission pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 17-A, section 1354, subsection 2, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=34&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0033&item=1&snum=127 |