ME LD33 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Adjust the Lifetime Limit for the Receipt of TANF Benefits
Title
An Act To Adjust the Lifetime Limit for the Receipt of TANF Benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Brakey [R] | Rep. Paul Chace [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #260 (Y: 77 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #171 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #171 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-06-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 260 (Yeas 77 - Nays 69 - Absent 4 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-07 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-31 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-25 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-05-25 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2017-05-25 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 171 Yeas 16 - Nays 19 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to ACCEPT The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report FAILED |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report . |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report . |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-01-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2017-01-10 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |