ME LD323 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - The Resolve was in the possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - The Resolve was in the possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Provide Funding to the Department of Transportation To Complete a Service Plan for the Development of Passenger Rail Service to Lewiston and Auburn
Title
Resolve, To Provide Funding to the Department of Transportation To Complete a Service Plan for the Development of Passenger Rail Service to Lewiston and Auburn
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-16 | Senate | The Resolve was in the possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York PLACED ON THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE |
2015-04-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-16 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-28), in concurrence. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-28) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-28). |
2015-04-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2015-04-02 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-02-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator Collins of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Transportation, in concurrence. |
2015-02-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2015-02-10 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |