ME LD321 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Probate and Trust Law Advisory Commission To Review Maine's Probate Code and the Uniform Probate Code
Title
Resolve, Directing the Probate and Trust Law Advisory Commission To Review Maine's Probate Code and the Uniform Probate Code
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2013-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-02 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-03-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-20 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-03-20 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2013-03-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-02-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator Valentino of York REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-02-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-07 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2013-02-07 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-02-07 | House | Representative PRIEST for the Probate and Trust Law Advisory Commission pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 18-A, section 1-803, subsection 2, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |