ME LD320 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Provide MaineCare Coverage for Chiropractic Treatment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Provide MaineCare Coverage for Chiropractic Treatment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2018-06-21HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-06-21HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-06-21HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-06-21HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-199) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-507) thereto.
2018-06-20SenateSent down for concurrence
2018-06-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-199) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-507) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2018-06-20SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-199) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-507) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
2018-06-20SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-507) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-199) READ and ADOPTED
2018-06-20SenateUnder further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-199) was ADOPTED
2018-06-20SenateUnder suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-199)
2018-06-20SenateOn Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2018-05-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
2017-06-09SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT
2017-06-08HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-08HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-07HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-07HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-199).
2017-06-07HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-06-07HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-199) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-06-07HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-06-07HouseOn motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-06-07HouseReports READ.
2017-06-07SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-06-07SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-199)
2017-06-07SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-199) READ and ADOPTED
2017-06-07SenateREAD ONCE
2017-06-07SenateOn motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2017-06-07SenateReports Read
2017-01-31HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-01-31HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2017-01-31SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-01-31SenateREFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2017-01-31SenateCommittee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback