ME LD320 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Tracking of Wounded Animals with a Leashed Dog
Title
An Act Regarding the Tracking of Wounded Animals with a Leashed Dog
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-05-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-76), in concurrence. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-76) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2015-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-76). |
2015-04-28 | House | READ the Second Time. |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2015-04-23 | House | TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-76) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-04-23 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2015-04-23 | House | On motion of Representative SHAW of Standish, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-23 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator Davis of Piscataquis, REFERRED to the Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife, in concurrence. |
2015-02-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2015-02-10 | House | Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |