ME LD32 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Expand the Types of Vaccines That May Be Administered by Pharmacists
Title
An Act To Expand the Types of Vaccines That May Be Administered by Pharmacists
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Johnson [D] | Sen. Linda Sanborn [D] | Sen. John Cleveland [D] | Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] |
Sen. John Patrick [D] | Rep. James Campbell [R] | Sen. Amy Volk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-02-26 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-26 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-02-26 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-02-26 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2013-02-21 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-01-15 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-01-15 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-01-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator Patrick of Oxford REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2013-01-15 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |