ME LD310 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish Equitable Education Requirements for Judges
Title
An Act To Establish Equitable Education Requirements for Judges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-03-29 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-03-18 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-03-18 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-04 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on February 4, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=310&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0136&item=1&snum=130 |