ME LD310 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prevent Organized Retail Crime
Title
An Act To Prevent Organized Retail Crime
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-04-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-04-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-30). |
2015-04-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2015-04-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-30). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-30) READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2015-02-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-10 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator Rosen of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |
2015-02-10 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |