ME LD31 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Summary
An Act To Amend the Legislative Term Limit Laws
Title
An Act To Amend the Legislative Term Limit Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2009-05-19 | (S) On motion by Senator SIMPSON of Androscoggin Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 84 34 Yeas - 0 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent | |
2009-05-19 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-05-18 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-14 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-13 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-12 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-07 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-07 | (S) On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT | |
2009-05-07 | (S) Reports READ | |
2009-05-06 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-06 | (H) Subsequently, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-06 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2009-05-05 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-30 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-29 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2009-04-28 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Representative BEAUDETTE of Biddeford moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2009-01-15 | (S) On motion by Senator Marrache of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-01-13 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-01-13 | (H) On motion of Representative TRINWARD of Waterville, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. | |
2009-01-13 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2009-01-07 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-01-07 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2009-01-07 | (H) On motion of Representative TRINWARD of Waterville, TABLED pending REFERENCE. | |
2009-01-07 | (H) Committee on LEGAL AND VETERANS AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed. |