ME LD308 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize Municipalities To Increase Notification Time Periods for Rent Increases and Terminations of Tenancies at Will
Title
An Act To Authorize Municipalities To Increase Notification Time Periods for Rent Increases and Terminations of Tenancies at Will
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Kessler [D] | Rep. Heidi Brooks [D] | Sen. Anne Carney [D] | Rep. Lori Gramlich [D] |
Rep. James Handy [D] | Sen. Chloe Maxmin [D] | Rep. Deane Rykerson [D] | Rep. Michael Sylvester [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #272 (Y: 71 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #149 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #149 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2019-06-17 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 272V 71 having voted in the affirmative and 75 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2019-06-17 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2019-06-03 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2019-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-357) in concurrence |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-357) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-29 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 149 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-357). |
2019-05-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-28 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-357) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-28 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Subsequently On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-01-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2019-01-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed. |