ME LD308 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 54 Yeas 32 - Nays 1 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 54 Yeas 32 - Nays 1 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit Charging Maine Seniors Higher Automobile Insurance Premiums Based Solely on Their Age
Title
An Act To Prohibit Charging Maine Seniors Higher Automobile Insurance Premiums Based Solely on Their Age
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Enactment RC #54 (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 54 Yeas 32 - Nays 1 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-03-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-6). |
2017-03-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary. Report Accepted. |
2017-03-21 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | READ a SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-6) |
2017-03-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-6) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-03-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-01-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-01-31 | Senate | REFERENCE to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed |