ME LD306 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - On motion by President THIBODEAU of Waldo the bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - On motion by President THIBODEAU of Waldo the bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require State Compliance with Federal REAL ID Guidelines
Title
An Act To Require State Compliance with Federal REAL ID Guidelines
Sponsors
Sen. William Diamond [D] | Sen. Ronald Collins [R] | Sen. Susan Deschambault [D] | Sen. James Dill [D] |
Sen. Dawn Hill [D] | Sen. Roger Katz [R] | Rep. Richard Cebra [R] | Rep. James Gillway [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - House - Adopt Hah-29 To Cas-17 RC #28 (Y: 48 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-04-11 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #27 (Y: 115 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #59 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #27 (Y: 115 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #59 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | On motion by President THIBODEAU of Waldo the bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT |
2017-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-17). |
2017-04-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-04-11 | House | Subsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (S-17) was ADOPTED. |
2017-04-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 28 (Yeas 48 - Nays 94 - Absent 8 - Excused 1) |
2017-04-11 | House | On motion of Representative HICKMAN of Winthrop, House Amendment "A" (H-29) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-17) was READ and FAILED adoption. |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-17) was READ. |
2017-04-11 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-04-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 27 (Yeas 115 - Nays 30 - Absent 5 - Excused 1) |
2017-04-11 | House | On motion of Representative McLEAN of Gorham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-17) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | by Committee Amendment "A" (S-17) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-04-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 59 Yeas 31 - Nays 4 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2017-04-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York the The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-02-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-02-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-01-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed |