ME LD305 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Include Certain Employees in the Bureau of Forestry's Forest Protection Unit in the Laws Concerning Cancer Suffered by Firefighters
Title
An Act To Include Certain Employees in the Bureau of Forestry's Forest Protection Unit in the Laws Concerning Cancer Suffered by Firefighters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #152 (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-69). |
2021-06-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-02 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-69) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-02 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-02 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-02 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-69) |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-69) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-05-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 152 Yeas 27 - Nays 6 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-69) Report ACCEPTED |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-04-29 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-08 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-03-08 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on February 4, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |