ME LD305 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-28 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.6, Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-28 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.6, Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize Circus Conservatory of America To Grant Baccalaureate Degrees
Title
An Act To Authorize Circus Conservatory of America To Grant Baccalaureate Degrees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.6, Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2015-07-21 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence |
2015-02-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-10 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator Langley of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS |
2015-02-10 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=305&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0120&item=1&snum=127 |