ME LD302 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Eliminate the Working Cars for Working Families Program
Title
An Act To Eliminate the Working Cars for Working Families Program
Sponsors
Rep. Shelley Rudnicki [R] | Rep. Danny Costain [R] | Rep. Scott Cyrway [R] | Rep. Josanne Dolloff [R] |
Rep. Maryanne Kinney [R] | Rep. Daniel Newman [R] | Rep. Tracy Quint [R] | Rep. Heidi Sampson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-03-26 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-03-24 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-03-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-02-01 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-01 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 1, 2021. |