ME LD302 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Roll Call Number 38 Yeas 34 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Roll Call Number 38 Yeas 34 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make Supplemental Appropriations and Allocations for the Expenditures of State Government and To Change Certain Provisions of the Law Necessary to the Proper Operations of State Government for the Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2017
Title
An Act To Make Supplemental Appropriations and Allocations for the Expenditures of State Government and To Change Certain Provisions of the Law Necessary to the Proper Operations of State Government for the Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - House - Enactment - Emer RC #11 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Enact-emer 2/3 Elect RC #38 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Indef Pp Hah-4 To Cas-2 RC #10 (Y: 108 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Enact-emer 2/3 Elect RC #38 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Indef Pp Hah-4 To Cas-2 RC #10 (Y: 108 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | Senate | Roll Call Number 38 Yeas 34 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2017-03-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. 2/3 Vote Required |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | READ a SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-2) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-03-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 11 (Yeas 142 - Nays 1 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2017-03-02 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken. |
2017-03-02 | House | Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-03-02 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-03-02 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-03-02 | House | On motion of Representative FREDETTE of Newport, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-03-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-2). |
2017-03-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-03-02 | House | Subsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (S-2) was ADOPTED. |
2017-03-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 10 (Yeas 108 - Nays 38 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2017-03-02 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, House Amendment "A" (H-4) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-2) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2017-03-02 | House | On motion of Representative CARDONE of Bangor, House Amendment "A" (H-4) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-2) was READ. |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-2) was READ. |
2017-03-02 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-03-02 | House | The Committee Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-03-02 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative CARDONE of Bangor REMOVED. |
2017-03-02 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-02-28 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-2) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-02-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-01-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-01-31 | Senate | REFERENCE to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed |