ME LD302 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Public Utilities Commission To Review Certain Electricity Distribution Charges Assessed on Businesses
Title
Resolve, Directing the Public Utilities Commission To Review Certain Electricity Distribution Charges Assessed on Businesses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2013-04-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-30 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-58), in concurrence. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-58) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-04-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-23 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-58). |
2013-04-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2013-04-10 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-02-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator Cleveland of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY and ordered printed, in concurrence. |
2013-02-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-07 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |