ME LD300 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Preserve Funding for the Maine Clean Election Act by Removing Gubernatorial Candidates from Eligibility
Title
An Act To Preserve Funding for the Maine Clean Election Act by Removing Gubernatorial Candidates from Eligibility
Sponsors
Rep. Paula Sutton [R] | Sen. Eric Brakey [R] | Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R] | Rep. Stephanie Hawke [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Pierce [R] | Rep. Deborah Sanderson [R] | Rep. Heather Sirocki [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Insist RC #150 (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Pass To Be Engrossed As Amend RC #144 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #116 (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #66 (Y: 82 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Pass To Be Engrossed As Amend RC #144 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #116 (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #66 (Y: 82 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Subsequently The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With ACCEPTANCE of The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 150 Yeas 14 - Nays 20 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin To INSIST FAILED |
2017-05-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-18 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 144 Yeas 18 - Nays 16 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Subsequently the bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-83) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED As Amended In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-83) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-09 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 116 Yeas 17 - Nays 16 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-83) Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-04 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senator MASON of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-05-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 66 (Yeas 82 - Nays 63 - Absent 5 - Excused 1) |
2017-05-02 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-02 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2017-01-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |