ME LD297 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - LD 297 In Senate, June 7, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 35 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - LD 297 In Senate, June 7, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 35 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve the Administration of Election Recounts
Title
An Act To Improve the Administration of Election Recounts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #236 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #229 (Y: 127 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #229 (Y: 127 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | Senate | LD 297 In Senate, June 7, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 35 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2017-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-05 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 229V 127 having voted in the affirmative and 16 in the negative, with 7 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2017-06-05 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-05-23 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-156) in concurrence |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-156) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-156). |
2017-05-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2017-01-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |