ME LD295 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Repeal Restrictions That Prohibit Certain Advanced Practice Registered Nurses from Providing Essential Health Care Services
Title
An Act To Repeal Restrictions That Prohibit Certain Advanced Practice Registered Nurses from Providing Essential Health Care Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-04-07 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-04-01 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-04-01 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-18 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-03-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-04 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-02-01 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-01 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 1, 2021. |