ME LD289 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 57 Yeas 23 - Nays 10 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 57 Yeas 23 - Nays 10 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit the Use of Certain Disposable Food Service Containers
Title
An Act To Prohibit the Use of Certain Disposable Food Service Containers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Enactment RC #57 (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #37 (Y: 86 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #37 (Y: 86 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 57 Yeas 23 - Nays 10 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator TIMBERLAKE of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT |
2019-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-49) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-55) thereto |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-49) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-55) thereto ADOPTED in concurrence |
2019-04-16 | Senate | House Amendment "A" (H-55) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-49) ADOPTED |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-49) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2019-04-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senator TIMBERLAKE of Androscoggin asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw his motion for a Roll Call. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-49) Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-11 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senator CARSON of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-04 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-49) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-55) thereto. |
2019-04-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-49) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-55) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2019-04-04 | House | On motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, House Amendment "A" (H-55) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-49) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-49) was READ. |
2019-04-04 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-04-04 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 37 (Yeas 87 - Nays 51 - Absent 11 - Excused 1 Vacant 1) |
2019-04-04 | House | On motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-04 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-04-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-02 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-04-02 | House | On motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2019-04-02 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2019-01-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |