ME LD287 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Provide a Sales Tax Exemption for Diapers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Provide a Sales Tax Exemption for Diapers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-10SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
2023-07-26SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
2023-05-11SenateOn motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2023-05-09HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-05-09HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2023-05-04SenateREAD A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-47) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-64) thereto in concurrence
2023-05-04SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2023-05-03SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2023-05-03SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-47) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-64) thereto ADOPTED
2023-05-03SenateHouse Amendment "A" (H-64) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-47) READ and ADOPTED
2023-05-03SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-47) READ and ADOPTED
2023-05-03SenateREAD ONCE
2023-05-03SenateOn motion by Senator GROHOSKI of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
2023-05-03SenateReports Read
2023-05-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-05-02HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-47) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-64) thereto.
2023-05-02HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2023-05-02HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-47) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-64) thereto was ADOPTED.
2023-05-02HouseOn motion of Representative QUINT of Hodgdon, House Amendment "A" (H-64) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-47) was READ and ADOPTED.
2023-05-02HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-47) was READ.
2023-05-02HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2023-05-02HouseOn motion of Representative PERRY of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2023-05-02HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2023-04-27HouseUnfinished Business
2023-04-25HouseUnfinished Business
2023-04-20HouseUnfinished Business
2023-04-20HouseLater today assigned.
2023-04-20HouseOn motion of Representative MATLACK of St. George, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
2023-04-20HouseReports READ.
2023-04-19JointReported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
2023-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
2023-03-02JointVoted: Divided Report
2023-03-02JointWork Session Held
2023-01-31SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence
2023-01-31HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-01-31HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
2023-01-31HouseCommittee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback