ME LD287 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Impose on Mental Health Professionals a Duty To Warn and Protect
Title
An Act To Impose on Mental Health Professionals a Duty To Warn and Protect
Sponsors
Rep. Denise Tepler [D] | Sen. Donna Bailey [D] | Sen. Pinny Beebe-Center [D] | Rep. Lori Gramlich [D] |
Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] | Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] | Rep. Victoria Morales [D] | Rep. Holly Stover [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-450) in concurrence |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-450) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARPENTER of Aroostook the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-450). |
2019-06-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-05 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-450) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-05 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-05 | House | On motion of Representative BAILEY of Saco, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator Carpenter of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2019-01-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-22 | House | On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed. |