ME LD286 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make Election Day a State Holiday
Title
An Act To Make Election Day a State Holiday
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-14 - House - Insist RC #245 (Y: 77 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - Passage To Be Engrossed RC #208 (Y: 68 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - Adopt Hah-492 RC #207 (Y: 74 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #149 (Y: 14 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-06-09 - House - Passage To Be Engrossed RC #208 (Y: 68 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - Adopt Hah-492 RC #207 (Y: 74 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #149 (Y: 14 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-06-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 245 (Yeas 77 - Nays 60 - Absent 14 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-14 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-39) and House Amendment "A" (H-492) |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate INSISTED To The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-06-09 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 208 (Yeas 68 - Nays 63 - Absent 20 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-09 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-39). and House Amendment "A" (H-492) |
2021-06-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 207 (Yeas 74 - Nays 60 - Absent 17 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative COLLINGS of Portland, House Amendment "A" (H-492) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-39) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-09 | House | On further motion of same Representative the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative COLLINGS of Portland, the House RECEDED. |
2021-06-09 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-06-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-02 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-06-02 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-05-19 | Senate | The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 149 Yeas 14 - Nays 19 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report FAILED |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town the Bill and accompanying papers were COMMITTED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2021-04-28 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-03-11 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-03-11 | House | On motion of Representative MATLACK of St. George, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2021-03-11 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-03-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-02-24 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-02-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-01-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-28 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 28, 2021. |