ME LD286 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Promote and Encourage the Sustainability of the Elver Fishery
Title
An Act To Promote and Encourage the Sustainability of the Elver Fishery
Sponsors
Rep. Abden Simmons [R] | Sen. Joyce Maker [R] | Rep. Robert Alley [D] | Rep. Beth O'Connor [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Pierce [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-426), in concurrence. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-426) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-426). |
2017-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-06-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES in concurrence |
2017-01-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES. |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee on Marine Resources suggested and ordered printed. |