ME LD286 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules (Remarks Made) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence On motion by Senator FARNHAM of Penobscot Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 102 33 Yeas - 2 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules (Remarks Made) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence On motion by Senator FARNHAM of Penobscot Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 102 33 Yeas - 2 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow the Operation of Crematoriums at Oak Grove Cemetery and the Kelley Family Cemetery
Title
An Act To Allow the Operation of Crematoriums at Oak Grove Cemetery and the Kelley Family Cemetery
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules (Remarks Made) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence On motion by Senator FARNHAM of Penobscot Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 102 33 Yeas - 2 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2011-05-24 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-24 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-05-23 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-23 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-142) and Senate Amendment "B" (S-131). | |
2011-05-19 | (S) PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-142) AND Senate Amendment "B" (S-131) In NON-CONCURRENCE Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-05-19 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Senate Amendment "A" (S-86) and Indefinitely Postponed Same | |
2011-05-19 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Under Unanimous Consent Presented for President Raye Senate Amendment "B" (S-131) READ and ADOPTED | |
2011-05-19 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator PLOWMAN of Penobscot Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-142) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-86) | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-142) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-86). | |
2011-05-16 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME under unanimous consent Senator Courtney of York presented for Senator RAYE of Washington Senate Amendment "A" (S-86) READ and ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-142) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-86) In NON-CONCURRENCE Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-05-16 | (S) Taken from the table by the President ProTem Committee Amendment "A" (H-142) ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2011-05-13 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Tabled Later Today Assigned pending ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-142) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-13 | (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York the Senate RECONSIDER Adoption of Committee Amendment "A" (H-142) | |
2011-05-13 | (S) READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-142) READ and ADOPTED | |
2011-05-13 | (S) Taken from the table by the President On motion by Senator McCORMICK of Kennebec Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED | |
2011-05-11 | (S) Reports READ On motion by Senator McCORMICK of Kennebec Tabled Later Today Assigned pending ACCEPTANCE of ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-10 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-142) | |
2011-05-10 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2011-05-10 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-142) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) On motion of Representative CURTIS of Madison, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) On motion by Senator McCormick of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |