ME LD285 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-31 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-31 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Qualifications of Candidates for Office
Title
An Act Regarding the Qualifications of Candidates for Office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-05-31 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-31 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-05-26 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-341) in concurrence | |
2011-05-26 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-25 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2011-05-25 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-341) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2011-05-25 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-25 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-341) | |
2011-05-25 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-05-25 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2011-05-25 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-02-03 | (S) On motion by Senator Farnham of Penobscot, REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |