ME LD283 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase the Jurisdictional Limits for Small Claims
Title
An Act To Increase the Jurisdictional Limits for Small Claims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #524 (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #488 (Y: 80 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #488 (Y: 80 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Senate INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-590), in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2018-03-06 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-06 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-590) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-590) READ and ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-03-01 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 524 Yeas 18 - Nays 15 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Subsequently On motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-590) Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-20 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senator KEIM of Oxford moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reports READ |
2018-02-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 488 (Yeas 80 - Nays 64 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2018-02-15 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-02-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2017-01-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |