ME LD281 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Modify the State Valuation of the Towns of Madison, Skowhegan, East Millinocket and Jay To Reflect the Loss of Valuation of Major Taxpayers in Those Towns
Title
Resolve, To Modify the State Valuation of the Towns of Madison, Skowhegan, East Millinocket and Jay To Reflect the Loss of Valuation of Major Taxpayers in Those Towns
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Mccabe [D] | Sen. Rodney Whittemore [R] | Rep. Larry Dunphy [R] | Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R] |
Rep. John Picchiotti [R] | Rep. Stanley Short [D] | Rep. Thomas Skolfield [R] | Rep. Joel Stetkis [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - House - Adopt C A As Am By Hah-500 RC #390 (Y: 88 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #381 (Y: 87 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #381 (Y: 87 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2015-07-16 | House | Carried over from the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 555. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 555. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE , in concurrence. |
2015-06-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-24 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator McCORMICK of Kennebec The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-478) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-500) thereto , in concurrence. |
2015-06-23 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-23 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2015-06-23 | House | Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-478) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-500) thereto |
2015-06-23 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 390 (Yeas 88 - Nays 55 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-23 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-478) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-500) thereto ADOPTED. |
2015-06-23 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, House Amendment "A" (H-500) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-478) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-06-23 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-478). |
2015-06-23 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-478). |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Sent forthwith to the Engrossing Division. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-478) , in concurrence. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-478) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-06-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator McCORMICK of Kennebec The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-06-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-23 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-478). |
2015-06-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2015-06-23 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-478) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-06-23 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2015-06-23 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 381 (Yeas 87 - Nays 56 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-23 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-06-23 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-06-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-19 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-06-19 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2015-06-19 | House | Representative GIDEON of Freeport moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2015-06-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator McCormick of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on Taxation, in concurrence. |
2015-02-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-05 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |