ME LD280 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Include Tax-exempt, Nonprofit Regional Transportation Providers under the Maine Tort Claims Act
Title
An Act To Include Tax-exempt, Nonprofit Regional Transportation Providers under the Maine Tort Claims Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #274 (Y: 8 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-06-09 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #288 (Y: 64 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-06-09 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #288 (Y: 64 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-12 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-12 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-464). |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 274 Yeas 8 - Nays 25 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report . FAILED |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-464). |
2017-06-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-464) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-09 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-09 | House | On further motion of same Representative the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 288 (Yeas 64 - Nays 76 - Absent 10 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-09 | House | Motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED. |
2017-06-09 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-09 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2017-06-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2017-01-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |