ME LD274 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Maine Health Data Organization To Determine the Best Methods and Definitions To Use in Collecting Data To Better Understand Racial and Ethnic Disparities in the Provision of Health Care in Maine
Title
Resolve, Directing the Maine Health Data Organization To Determine the Best Methods and Definitions To Use in Collecting Data To Better Understand Racial and Ethnic Disparities in the Provision of Health Care in Maine
Sponsors
Rep. Denise Tepler [D] | Rep. Poppy Arford [D] | Rep. Heidi Brooks [D] | Sen. Heather Sanborn [D] |
Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-57) in concurrence |
2021-05-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | Subsequently, the Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-57) In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2021-05-19 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, Committee Amendment "A" (H-26) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2021-05-19 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, under further suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-26) . |
2021-05-19 | House | On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-05-19 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-04-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-04-28 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-04-28 | House | On motion of Representative DILLINGHAM of Oxford, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-26) AND House Amendment "A" (H-57) in concurrence |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-30 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2021-03-30 | House | Subsequently, the Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-26) and House Amendment "A" (H-57) |
2021-03-30 | House | On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, House Amendment "A" (H-57) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-03-30 | House | On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-03-30 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-03-30 | House | Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2021-03-30 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-26), in concurrence. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-26) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-03-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-26). |
2021-03-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-03-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-03-10 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-03-04 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-03-04 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-02 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-01-28 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-28 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 28, 2021. |