ME LD274 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Allow the Sale of Ethanol-free Gasoline Statewide

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Allow the Sale of Ethanol-free Gasoline Statewide

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-04-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-16HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-04-11HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-11HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
2019-04-11HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-04-11HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-04-04SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-04-04SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED
2019-04-04SenateREAD ONCE
2019-04-04SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED
2019-01-22HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-22HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
2019-01-22SenateCommittee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback