ME LD273 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on April 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-11 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on April 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-11 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Encourage and Enhance the Future of Waste-to-energy Facilities by Establishing a Portfolio Requirement for Electricity from Waste Energy Resources
Title
An Act To Encourage and Enhance the Future of Waste-to-energy Facilities by Establishing a Portfolio Requirement for Electricity from Waste Energy Resources
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Campbell [R] | Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] | Sen. James Dill [D] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] |
Rep. Denise Harlow [D] | Sen. Craig Hickman [D] | Rep. John Martin [D] | Rep. Stanley Short [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #635 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-08 - House - Recede And Concur RC #574 (Y: 71 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Adopt Sas-376 To Cah-519 RC #592 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #591 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Indef Postpone Bill & Papers RC #478 (Y: 73 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-08 - House - Recede And Concur RC #574 (Y: 71 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Adopt Sas-376 To Cah-519 RC #592 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #591 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Indef Postpone Bill & Papers RC #478 (Y: 73 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 635 Yeas 20 - Nays 15 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2016-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator WOODSOME of York The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With INDEFINITE POSTPONEMENT of Bill and accompanying papers in concurrence |
2016-04-08 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-08 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, the House INSISTED on INDEFINITELY POSTPONING the Bill and accompanying papers. |
2016-04-08 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 574 (Yeas 71 - Nays 74 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2016-04-08 | House | Motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED. |
2016-04-08 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2016-04-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-07 | House | Later today assigned. |
2016-04-07 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-376) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-376) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator WOODSOME of York Senate Amendment "A" (S-376) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-519) READ |
2016-04-05 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 591 Yeas 20 - Nays 15 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Subsequently, The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator WOODSOME of York to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senator WOODSOME of York moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-17 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Motion by Senator WOODSOME of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Reports READ |
2016-02-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-02-25 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 478 (Yeas 73 - Nays 69 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2016-02-25 | House | On motion of Representative CAMPBELL of Newfield the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2016-02-25 | House | Representative DION of Portland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2016-02-25 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2016-02-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-23 | House | Later today assigned. |
2016-02-23 | House | On motion of Representative DION of Portland TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2016-02-23 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-07-21 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence |
2015-02-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology, in concurrence. |
2015-02-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |