ME LD272 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Funds for Municipal Sand and Salt Storage Facilities
Title
An Act To Provide Funds for Municipal Sand and Salt Storage Facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Collins [R] | Sen. Jonathan Courtney [R] | Sen. William Diamond [D] | Rep. Jeffery Gifford [R] |
Rep. Paul Gilbert [D] | Rep. Wayne Parry [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Schneider [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD) | |
2011-04-27 | (S) On motion by Senator COLLINS of York PLACED ON THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-27) | |
2011-04-14 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (S-27) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) On motion of Representative CEBRA of Naples, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-27) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-04-12 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-04-07 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2011-04-07 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-27) READ and ADOPTED | |
2011-04-07 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2011-04-07 | (S) 22 Yeas - 13 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2011-04-07 | (S) Reports READ On motion by Senator COLLINS of York Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-27) Report ACCEPTED (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 28 | |
2011-02-03 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. | |
2011-02-01 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-02-01 | (S) On motion by Senator Collins of York REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION | |
2011-02-01 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2011-02-01 | (S) Committee on TRANSPORTATION |