ME LD272 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Summary
An Act To License Home Building and Improvement Contractors
Title
An Act To License Home Building and Improvement Contractors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2010-03-30 | (S) On motion by Senator SCHNEIDER of Penobscot The Senate ADHERED To ACCEPTANCE of Majority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report | |
2010-03-29 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) On motion of Representative SMITH of Monmouth, The House INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-760). | |
2010-03-26 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2010-03-26 | (S) On motion by Senator SCHNEIDER of Penobscot Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-03-26 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President | |
2010-03-26 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending her motion to ACCEPT Majority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-03-26 | (S) Senator SCHNEIDER of Penobscot moved to Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-03-26 | (S) Reports READ | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-760) | |
2010-03-25 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-760) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 302 (Yeas 76 - Nays 70 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) | |
2010-03-24 | (H) On motion of Representative SMITH of Monmouth the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2009-06-15 | (S) CARRIED OVER TO ANY SPECIAL OR REGULAR SESSION OF THE 124th LEGISLATURE PURSUANT TO JOINT ORDER HP 1053, IN CONCURRENCE | |
2009-06-13 | (H) Carried over to any special or regular session of the 124th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1053. | |
2009-01-27 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Sullivan of York, REFERRED to the Committee on BUSINESS, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on BUSINESS, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) Committee on Business, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |