ME LD271 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Failed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Failed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act for Providers across Multiple Sectors To Inquire of Clients and Customers about Former Military Service
Title
An Act for Providers across Multiple Sectors To Inquire of Clients and Customers about Former Military Service
Sponsors
Rep. Bettyann Sheats [D] | Sen. Everett Carson [D] | Sen. Michael Carpenter [D] | Rep. Owen Casas [I] |
Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R] | Rep. Sheldon Hanington [R] | Rep. John Madigan [D] | Rep. Deane Rykerson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-06 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-06 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-04-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-27 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS |
2017-04-27 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-27 | House | Representative HYMANSON from the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Reporting that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-01-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=271&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0204&item=1&snum=128 |