ME LD270 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Education To Study the Regional Adjustment
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Education To Study the Regional Adjustment
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Stewart [R] | Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] | Rep. Heidi Sampson [R] | Rep. Paul Stearns [R] |
Rep. David Woodsome [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2022-04-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-486). |
2022-04-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-05 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-486) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-05 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-05 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-486) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-486) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-05 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-04-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-03-31 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-03-03 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-03 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-04-06 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 28, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |